Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henri de Lorraine-Vaudémont

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Metz, France

Apostolic Administrator of Metz


Events

DateEventTitle
1457²AppointedBishop of Thérouanne, France
16 May 1485AppointedBishop of Metz, France
16 Jul 1501ResignedBishop of Metz, France
16 Jul 1501AppointedApostolic Administrator of Metz, France
20 Oct 1505DiedBishop Emeritus of Metz, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Henri de Lorraine-Vaudémont
Bishop Henri de Lorraine-Vaudémont (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Metz

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 196, and Page 190
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1457, Number 58*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 1 Mar 2021

Quantcast