Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Damián Lopez de Haro y Villarda, O.SS.T. †

Deceased

Bishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Sep 1581³Born
9 Feb 164361.3SelectedBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
13 Jul 164361.7ConfirmedBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
14 Feb 164462.3Ordained BishopBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
13 Jun 164462.7InstalledBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
24 Aug 164866.9DiedBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Damián Lopez de Haro y Villarda
Bishop Damián Lopez de Haro y Villarda O.SS.T. (born , died ) Bishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceToledo, Archdiocese of Toledo, Spain
Ordained BishopTrinitaires, Convent, Madrid

  • a bishop for 4.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 286
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 172, Number 1,073
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1644, Number 2
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 57, Number 4,191
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 68, Number 5,315

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast