Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Sancho López de Ayerbe, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Tarragona, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
5 Dec 1343AppointedBishop of Tarazona, Spain
30 Oct 1346AppointedBishop of Tarragona, Spain
22 Aug 1357DiedBishop of Tarragona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Sancho López de Ayerbe
Archbishop Sancho López de Ayerbe O.F.M. (died ) Archbishop of Tarragona

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 486, and Page 479

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 29 Apr 2021

Quantcast