Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolas Longespee

Deceased

Bishop of Salisbury, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Dec 1291SelectedBishop of Salisbury, England, Great Britain
22 Dec 1291ConfirmedBishop of Salisbury, England, Great Britain
16 Mar 1292Ordained BishopBishop of Salisbury, England, Great Britain
18 May 1297DiedBishop of Salisbury, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Nicolas Longespee
Bishop Nicolas Longespee (died ) Bishop of Salisbury

EventPlace
Ordained BishopCanterbury, Archdiocese of Canterbury, England

  • a bishop for 5.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 435
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 68
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 599
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 84, Number 6,921

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast