Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lambert

Deceased

Bishop of Arras, France


Events

DateEventTitle
10 Jul 1093AppointedBishop of Arras, France
19 Mar 1094Ordained BishopBishop of Arras, France
17 May 1115DiedBishop of Arras, France

MicroData Summary for Lambert
Bishop Lambert (died ) Bishop of Arras

  • a bishop for 21.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Page 495

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast