Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hugues Lestoquer, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Vannes, France


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Aug 1403AppointedBishop of Tréguier, France
25 Aug 1404AppointedBishop of Vannes, France
10 Oct 1408¹DiedBishop of Vannes, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Hugues Lestoquer
Bishop Hugues Lestoquer O.P. (died ) Bishop of Vannes

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 520, and Page 494

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 18 Feb 2021

Quantcast