Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bl. Roger Le Fort

Deceased

Archbishop of Bourges, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1277¹Born
3 Apr 132144.2AppointedBishop of Orléans, France
7 Jan 132851.0AppointedBishop of Limoges, France
18 Aug 134366.6AppointedArchbishop of Bourges, France
5 Aug 136790.5DiedArchbishop of Bourges, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bl. Roger Le Fort (VIAF: 295860617)
Archbishop Bl. Roger Le Fort (born 1277, died ) Archbishop of Bourges

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTernes
Death PlaceBourges, Archdiocese of Bourges

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 118, and Page 301
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 138

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 26 Feb 2021

Quantcast