Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pierre Cardinal de La Chapelle Taillefert

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina


Events

DateEventTitle
15 May 1291AppointedBishop of Carcassonne, France
15 Nov 1291Ordained BishopBishop of Carcassonne, France
25 Oct 1298AppointedArchbishop of Toulouse, France
15 Dec 1305AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Vitale
15 Dec 1305Elevated to Cardinal
Dec 1306³AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
1 Jun 1307InstalledCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
16 May 1312DiedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre de La Chapelle Taillefert
Pierre Cardinal de La Chapelle Taillefert (died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Chapelle-Taillefert, Diocese of Limoges, France
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceAvignon
Buried Place (Original)Sainte-Marie, Church, La Chapelle-Taillefert, Diocese of Limoges, France

  • a bishop for 20.5 years
  • a cardinal for 6.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 15 Dec 1305
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 166, and Page 488

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 20 Feb 2021

Quantcast