Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Guillaume de la Voute, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Albi, France


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Nov 1364AppointedBishop of Toulon, France
9 Dec 1368AppointedBishop of Marseille, France
1 Jun 1379AppointedBishop of Valence and Die, France
4 Nov 1383AppointedArchbishop of Albi, France
1392¹DiedArchbishop of Albi, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Guillaume de la Voute
Archbishop Guillaume de la Voute O.S.B. (died 1392) Archbishop of Albi

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 513, and Page 81
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 330, and Page 488

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 18 Feb 2021

Quantcast