Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sicard de Lautrec

Deceased

Bishop of Béziers, France


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Nov 1354AppointedBishop of Agde, France
18 Jul 1371AppointedBishop of Béziers, France
22 Jul 1383DiedBishop of Béziers, France

MicroData Summary for Sicard de Lautrec
Bishop Sicard de Lautrec (died ) Bishop of Béziers

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 138, and Page 76

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 8 Mar 2021

Quantcast