Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre de Latili

Deceased

Bishop of Chalons-sur-Marne, France


Events

DateEventTitle
12 May 1313AppointedBishop of Chalons-sur-Marne, France
2 Dec 1313Ordained BishopBishop of Chalons-sur-Marne, France
15 Mar 1328DiedBishop of Chalons-sur-Marne, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre de Latili
Bishop Pierre de Latili (died ) Bishop of Chalons-sur-Marne

EventPlace
Ordained BishopPontoise, Archdiocese of Rouen

  • a bishop for 14.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 175
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 101, Number 8,706

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 16 Dec 2020

Quantcast