Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Guillaume Cardinal de La Sudré, O.P. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Aug 1361AppointedBishop of Marseille, France
Sep 1361³Ordained BishopBishop of Marseille, France
18 Sep 1366AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo
18 Sep 1366Elevated to Cardinal
17 Sep 1367AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)
28 Sep 1373DiedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Guillaume de La Sudré
Guillaume Cardinal de La Sudré O.P. (died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLaguenne, Corrèze, Diocese of Tulle, France
Death PlaceAvignon
Buried Place (Original)Notre-Dame Chapel, Domincan, Church, Avignon

  • a bishop for 12.0 years
  • a cardinal for 7.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Sep 1366

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast