Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Lante, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Cremona, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
1385²AppointedBishop of Luni, Italy
13 Apr 1390AppointedBishop of Brescia, Italy
21 Oct 1390AppointedBishop of Cremona, Italy
4 Oct 1401AppointedBishop of Bergamo, Italy
27 Sep 1402AppointedBishop of Cremona, Italy
1405²DiedBishop of Cremona, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Lante
Bishop Francesco Lante O.F.M. (died 1405) Bishop of Cremona

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 396, and Page 215
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 214, and Page 147
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 318

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 26 Jun 2021

Quantcast