Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Jean Cardinal de La Grange, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Frascati


Events

DateEventTitle
7 Feb 1373AppointedBishop of Amiens, France
20 Dec 1375AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marcello
20 Dec 1375Elevated to Cardinal
16 Sep 1394AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
24 Apr 1402³DiedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean de La Grange
Jean Cardinal de La Grange O.S.B. (died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Frascati

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGermolles
Death PlaceAvignon

  • a cardinal for 26.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 85
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 Dec 1375

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast