Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Géraud de La Briçoigne

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Pons-de-Thomières, France


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Dec 1430AppointedBishop of Pamiers, France
16 Apr 1434AppointedBishop of Saint-Pons-de-Thomières, France
26 Oct 1463DiedBishop of Saint-Pons-de-Thomières, France

MicroData Summary for Géraud de La Briçoigne
Bishop Géraud de La Briçoigne (died ) Bishop of Saint-Pons-de-Thomières

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 218
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 94

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 22 Feb 2021

Quantcast