Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Espárago de La Barca

Deceased

Archbishop of Tarragona, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
12 Jun 1212AppointedBishop of Pamplona, Spain
23 Feb 1215AppointedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain
3 Mar 1233DiedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Espárago de La Barca
Archbishop Espárago de La Barca (died ) Archbishop of Tarragona

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 387, and Page 478

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 29 Apr 2021

Quantcast