Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Gregory Petros V Kupelian

Deceased

Patriarch of Cilicia (Armenian), Lebanon


Events

DateEventTitle
11 May 1788SelectedPatriarch of Cilicia (Armenian), Lebanon
15 Sep 1788ConfirmedPatriarch of Cilicia (Armenian), Lebanon
17 Jun 1812DiedPatriarch of Cilicia (Armenian), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Gregory Petros V Kupelian
Patriarch Gregory Petros V Kupelian (died ) Patriarch of Cilicia

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 165

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast