Date | Age | Event | Title |
---|---|---|---|
25 Mar 1951 | Born | ||
28 May 1977 | 26.1 | Ordained Priest | Priest of Davenport, Iowa, USA |
20 Oct 2023 | 72.5 | Appointed | Administrator of Davenport, Iowa, USA |
Father
Kenneth E.
Kuntz
(born )
Administrator
of Davenport
Event | Place |
---|---|
Ordained Priest | Sacred Heart, Cathedral, Davenport, Diocese of Davenport, Iowa |
Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Davenport.
|
|
Source(s):
|
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024 Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 25 Feb 2024 |
✠