Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jakob von Kulm, O.T. †

Deceased

Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland


Events

DateEventTitle
22 Aug 1349SelectedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
18 Aug 1350ConfirmedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
19 Sep 1359DiedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland

MicroData Summary for Jakob von Kulm
Bishop Jakob von Kulm O.T. (died ) Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 217

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast