Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Matthäus von Krakau

Deceased

Bishop of Worms, Germany

Note/Previous Titular See: (refused Cardinalate)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1335¹Born
1380²45.0Ordained PriestPriest
19 Jun 140570.4AppointedBishop of Worms, Germany
27 Jun 140570.4Ordained BishopBishop of Worms, Germany
19 Sep 140873.7Elevated to Cardinal
19 Sep 140873.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Ciriaco alle Terme Diocleziane
5 Mar 141075.1DiedBishop of Worms, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Matthäus von Krakau (VIAF: 288641955)
Bishop Matthäus von Krakau (born 1335, died ) Bishop of Worms

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKraków, Diocese of Kraków, Poland
Death PlaceHeidelberg
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Worms, Diocese of Worms

  • a priest for 30.1 years
  • a bishop for 4.6 years
  • a cardinal for 1.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 535
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Sep 1408

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast