Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William de Kilkenny

Deceased

Bishop of Ely, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
25 Dec 1254AppointedBishop of Ely, England, Great Britain
15 Aug 1255Ordained BishopBishop of Ely, England, Great Britain
22 Sep 1256DiedBishop of Ely, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for William de Kilkenny
Bishop William de Kilkenny (died ) Bishop of Ely

EventPlace
Ordained BishopBelley, Diocese of Belley, France

  • a bishop for 1.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 61
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 329
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 90, Number 7,575

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast