Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Richard Kellaw, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Durham, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
31 Mar 1311SelectedBishop of Durham, England, Great Britain
11 May 1311ConfirmedBishop of Durham, England, Great Britain
30 May 1311Ordained BishopBishop of Durham, England, Great Britain
9 Oct 1316DiedBishop of Durham, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Richard Kellaw
Bishop Richard Kellaw O.S.B. (died ) Bishop of Durham

EventPlace
Ordained BishopYork, Archdiocese of York, England

  • a bishop for 5.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 231
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 70
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 288
  • osb: CB, 20 Mar 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 84, Number 6,947

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast