Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Joseph Kao

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Chowchich [Zhouzhi], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1898²Born
4 Oct 192224.7Ordained PriestPriest
30 May 194143.4AppointedPrefect of Chowchich [Zhouzhi], China
19 Jan 194345.0AppointedPrefect of Hungtung [Hongdong], China
Mar 194547.1ResignedPrefect of Hungtung [Hongdong], China
195153.0ResignedPrefect of Chowchich [Zhouzhi], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph Kao
Father Joseph Kao (born 1898) Prefect Emeritus of Chowchich [Zhouzhi]

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 12 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast