Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope John XXI

Joćo Pedro Julićo

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1210¹Born
1272¹62.0SelectedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal
3 Jun 127363.4Elevated to Cardinal
3 Jun 127363.4AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
May 1275³65.3ResignedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal
8 Sep 127666.6ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
20 Sep 127666.7InstalledPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
20 May 127767.3DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joćo Pedro Julićo (VIAF: 27109632)
Pope Joćo Pedro Julićo (born 1210, died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
Ordained BishopLyon, Archdiocese of Lyon, France

  • a cardinal for 3.2 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for .6 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 3 Jun 1273
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 144
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131, Number 11,725

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast