Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan de Valderas

Deceased

Bishop of Burgos, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
21 Aug 1357AppointedBishop of Jaén, Spain
5 Oct 1358AppointedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain
18 Jun 1361AppointedBishop of Burgos, Spain
1362¹DiedBishop of Burgos, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan de Valderas
Bishop Juan de Valderas (died 1362) Bishop of Burgos

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 151, and Page 444
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 262

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 29 Apr 2021

Quantcast