Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Theodor Joset

Deceased

Prefect of Hong Kong [Xianggang], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Oct 1804Born
183126.2Ordained PriestPriest
22 Apr 184136.5AppointedPrefect of Hong Kong [Xianggang], China
5 Aug 184237.8DiedPrefect of Hong Kong [Xianggang], China

MicroData Summary for Theodor Joset
Father Theodor Joset (born , died ) Prefect of Hong Kong [Xianggang]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCourfaivre
Death PlaceHong Kong, Prefecture Apostolic of Hong Kong [Xianggang]

  • a priest for 11.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 11 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast