Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pierre Cardinal Itier

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Albano


Events

DateEventTitle
10 May 1359AppointedBishop of Acqs (Dax), France
17 Sep 1361AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Quattro Coronati
17 Sep 1361Elevated to Cardinal
4 Feb 1364AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
20 May 1367DiedCardinal-Bishop of Albano

MicroData Summary for Pierre Itier
Pierre Cardinal Itier (died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Albano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChâteau, Beaumont, Diocese of Sarlat, France
Death PlaceAvignon
Buried Place (Original)Blessed Virgin Chapel, Dominican, Church, Avignon

  • a cardinal for 5.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 Sep 1361
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 97

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 8 Mar 2021

Quantcast