Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Matías Ibáñez de Segovia

Deceased

Bishop of La Paz, Bolivia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1697¹Born
14 Jul 174750.5SelectedBishop of La Paz, Bolivia
4 Sep 174750.6ConfirmedBishop of La Paz, Bolivia
27 Nov 174750.9Ordained BishopBishop of La Paz, Bolivia
25 Aug 175154.6DiedBishop of La Paz, Bolivia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Matías Ibáñez de Segovia
Bishop Matías Ibáñez de Segovia (born 1697, died ) Bishop of La Paz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLima, Archdiocese of Lima, Peru
Death PlaceLa Paz, Diocese of La Paz

  • a bishop for 3.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1747, Number 44
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 323
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 76, Number 6,099

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast