Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Holyman

Deceased

Bishop of Bristol, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
18 Nov 1554Ordained BishopBishop of Bristol, England, Great Britain
21 Jun 1555ConfirmedBishop of Bristol, England, Great Britain
20 Dec 1558DiedBishop of Bristol, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John Holyman
Bishop John Holyman (died ) Bishop of Bristol

EventPlace
Ordained BishopBishops, Chapel, London, Diocese of London, England

  • a bishop for 4.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 140
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1554, Number 13
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 69, Number 5,459
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 76, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast