Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfonso Herrera, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ariano, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
30 Jul 1576AppointedBishop of Gallipoli, Italy
25 Feb 1585AppointedBishop of Ariano, Italy
20 Dec 1602DiedBishop of Ariano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Herrera
Bishop Alfonso Herrera O.S.A. (died ) Bishop of Ariano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSpain

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 87, Number 531
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 201, and Page 117
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1576, Number 18*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast