Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Aimery Guenaud

Deceased

Archbishop of Rouen, France


Events

DateEventTitle
24 Jan 1332AppointedBishop of Auxerre, France
15 Feb 1339AppointedArchbishop of Rouen, France
17 Jan 1343DiedArchbishop of Rouen, France

MicroData Summary for Aimery Guenaud
Archbishop Aimery Guenaud (died ) Archbishop of Rouen

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 425, and Page 426
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 120

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 23 Feb 2021

Quantcast