Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Grodecký

Deceased

Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1525²Born
19 Nov 157247.8AppointedBishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
7 Jun 157348.4Ordained BishopBishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
6 Jan 157449.0DiedBishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johann Grodecký (VIAF: 23145003648661340074)
Bishop Johann Grodecký (born 1525, died ) Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGrodziec, near Cieszyn, Diocese of Olomouc (Olmütz)
Ordained BishopJesuit, Church, Wien, Diocese of Wien, Austria
Death PlaceOlomouc, Diocese of Olomouc (Olmütz)
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Olomouc, Diocese of Olomouc (Olmütz)

  • a bishop for .5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,096
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 262
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1573, Number 3
  • b/c2+: AT, 25 Feb 2019
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 239, Number 20,052

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast