Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Vincenzo Cardinal Grimani

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eustachio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 May 1653Born
22 Jul 169744.1Elevated to Cardinal
16 May 169844.9InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eustachio
26 Sep 171057.3DiedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eustachio

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Grimani
Vincenzo Cardinal Grimani (born , died ) Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eustachio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 13.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 22 Jul 1697

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast