Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Grosso della Rovere

Deceased

Bishop of Mende, France


Events

DateEventTitle
9 Jan 1492AppointedBishop of Gubbio, Italy
8 Nov 1504AppointedBishop of Mende, France
15 May 1524DiedBishop of Mende, France

MicroData Summary for Francesco Grosso della Rovere
Bishop Francesco Grosso della Rovere (died ) Bishop of Mende

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 244, and Page 193
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 151
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1492, Number 6*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast