Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Walter de Gray

Deceased

Archbishop of York, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Jan 1214AppointedBishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain
5 Oct 1214Ordained BishopBishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain
27 Mar 1216AppointedArchbishop of York, England, Great Britain
1 May 1255DiedArchbishop of York, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Walter de Gray
Archbishop Walter de Gray (died ) Archbishop of York

EventPlace
Ordained BishopCanterbury, Archdiocese of Canterbury, England

  • a bishop for 40.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 54
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 102, and Page 51
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 92, Number 7,793

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast