Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro González Mendoza

Deceased

Bishop of Salamanca, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
26 Jun 1560AppointedBishop of Salamanca, Spain
29 Sep 1560Ordained BishopBishop of Salamanca, Spain
10 Sep 1574DiedBishop of Salamanca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Pedro González Mendoza
Bishop Pedro González Mendoza (died ) Bishop of Salamanca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGuadalajara, Archdiocese of Toledo
Ordained BishopGuadalajara, Archdiocese of Toledo
Death PlaceGuadalajara, Archdiocese of Toledo

  • a bishop for 13.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c23: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 69, Number 402
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 289
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1560, Number 9
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 70, Number 5,515
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 78, Number 6,279

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast