Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alonso González Aguilar

Deceased

Bishop of León, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1544²Born
23 Sep 161369.7AppointedBishop of León, Spain
1 Dec 161369.9Ordained BishopBishop of León, Spain
2 Dec 161571.9DiedBishop of León, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alonso González Aguilar
Bishop Alonso González Aguilar (born 1544, died ) Bishop of León

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVilladiezma
Ordained BishopValladolid, Diocese of Valladolid

  • a bishop for 2.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bp/bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 218
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 130, Number 828
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1613, Number 21
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 77, Number 6,161

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast