Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Gautier Cardinal Gómez de Luna

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo

Titular See: (pseudocardinal)


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Feb 1357AppointedBishop of Palencia, Spain
19 Mar 1381Elevated to Cardinal
27 Aug 1381AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo
13 Jan 1391DiedCardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo

MicroData Summary for Gautier Gómez de Luna
Gautier Cardinal Gómez de Luna (died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAragón

  • a cardinal for 9.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Mar 1381
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 386

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 27 Apr 2021

Quantcast