Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro de Godoy, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Sigüenza, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1599¹Born
15 Nov 166364.8SelectedBishop of Osma, Spain
31 Mar 166465.2ConfirmedBishop of Osma, Spain
17 Aug 166465.6Ordained BishopBishop of Osma, Spain
22 Feb 167273.1SelectedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain
16 May 167273.3ConfirmedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain
25 Jan 167778.0DiedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro de Godoy (VIAF: 2860092)
Bishop Pedro de Godoy O.P. (born 1599, died ) Bishop of Sigüenza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAldeanueva de la Vera
Ordained BishopBejar

  • a bishop for 12.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128, Number 11,508
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 351
  • bp/bd: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 198, Number 1,240
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 268
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1664, Number 24
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 73, Number 5,819

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast