Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Marco Giustiniani

Deceased

Archbishop of Candia {Crete}, Greece


Events

DateEventTitle
24 Mar 1386AppointedBishop of Coron (Coronea), Greece
1 Dec 1390AppointedArchbishop of Corf¨, Greece
31 Aug 1392AppointedArchbishop of Candia {Crete}, Greece
1405²DiedArchbishop of Candia {Crete}, Greece

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marco Giustiniani
Archbishop Marco Giustiniani (died 1405) Archbishop of Candia {Crete}

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 215, and Page 216
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 209, and Page 212

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 9 Aug 2021

Quantcast