Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Andrés Girón

Deceased

Archbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1624¹Born
21 Jun 166036.4AppointedBishop of Lugo, Spain
1 Nov 166036.8Ordained BishopBishop of Lugo, Spain
2 Mar 166440.1SelectedBishop of Pamplona, Spain
28 Apr 166440.3ConfirmedBishop of Pamplona, Spain
2 Jun 167046.4AppointedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
7 Aug 168056.5DiedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Andrés Girón
Archbishop Andrés Girón (born 1624, died ) Archbishop of Santiago de Compostela

EventPlace
Birth PlaceToro, Diocese of Zamora
Ordained BishopAragon College, Madrid, Archdiocese of Toledo
Death PlaceCompostela, Archdiocese of Santiago de Compostela

  • a bishop for 19.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 166
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 224, and Page 272
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 192, Number 1,204
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1660, Number 34
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 73, Number 5,793

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast