Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martinho Gil

Deceased

Bishop of Silves (Sylves), Portugal


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Jun 1390AppointedBishop of Porto, Portugal
15 Feb 1391AppointedBishop of Silves (Sylves), Portugal
6 Feb 1404AppointedBishop of Évora, Portugal
1406¹AppointedBishop of Silves (Sylves), Portugal
1409¹DiedBishop of Silves (Sylves), Portugal

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Martinho Gil
Bishop Martinho Gil (died 1409) Bishop of Silves (Sylves)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 452, and Page 236
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 406

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 2 Jun 2021

Quantcast