Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Cristoforo Cardinal Giacobazzi

Deceased

Bishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Eustachio


Events

DateEventTitle
23 Mar 1523AppointedBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy
26 Dec 1530Ordained BishopBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy
22 Dec 1536Elevated to Cardinal
15 Jan 1537AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia
6 Sep 1537AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Eustachio
7 Oct 1540DiedBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy

MicroData Summary for Cristoforo Giacobazzi
Cristoforo Cardinal Giacobazzi (died ) Bishop of Cassano all’Jonio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlacePerugia, Diocese of Perugia

  • a bishop for 9.7 years
  • a cardinal for 3.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 156
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 22 Dec 1536
  • ob/c2+: CB, 6 Aug 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1530, Number 19
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 89, Number 7,486

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast