Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Andrea Cardinal Ghini Malpighi

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Susanna


Events

DateEventTitle
18 Dec 1329AppointedBishop of Arras, France
12 Sep 1334AppointedBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
20 Sep 1342AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Susanna
20 Sep 1342Elevated to Cardinal
2 Jun 1343DiedCardinal-Priest of Santa Susanna

MicroData Summary for Andrea Ghini Malpighi
Andrea Cardinal Ghini Malpighi (died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santa Susanna

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFirenze, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}, Italy
Death PlaceTraveling to, Perpignan
Buried Place (Original)Benedictine, Monastery, Firenze, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}, Italy

  • a cardinal for .7 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 Sep 1342
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 115, and Page 489

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 8 Mar 2021

Quantcast