Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gervais de Château-du-Loir

Deceased

Archbishop of Reims, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1007Born
19 Dec 103629.8Ordained BishopBishop of Le Mans, France
15 Oct 105548.7AppointedArchbishop of Reims, France
4 Jul 106760.4DiedArchbishop of Reims, France

MicroData Summary for Gervais de Château-du-Loir (VIAF: 1165154741631353110001)
Archbishop Gervais de Château-du-Loir (born , died ) Archbishop of Reims

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCosimon
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Reims, Archdiocese of Reims

  • a bishop for 30.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Page 562, and Page 608
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 88, Number 7,322

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast