Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean de Gaucourt

Deceased

Bishop of Laon, France


Events

DateEventTitle
30 Jul 1460AppointedBishop of Laon, France
29 Nov 1460Ordained BishopBishop of Laon, France
10 Jun 1468DiedBishop of Laon, France

MicroData Summary for Jean de Gaucourt
Bishop Jean de Gaucourt (died ) Bishop of Laon

  • a bishop for 7.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 173
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1460, Number 7
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 88, Number 7,354

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast