Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Consiglio Gatto, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Conza, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
Nov 1299²AppointedArchbishop of Oristano, Italy
21 Nov 1299Ordained BishopArchbishop of Oristano, Italy
30 Jan 1301AppointedArchbishop of Conza, Italy
1327¹DiedArchbishop of Conza, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Consiglio Gatto
Archbishop Consiglio Gatto O.P. (died 1327) Archbishop of Conza

  • a bishop for 27.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 101, and Page 203
  • b: CB, 19 Aug 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast