Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guillermo García Manrique

Deceased

Bishop of Oviedo, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Jul 1388AppointedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain
22 Dec 1389AppointedBishop of Oviedo, Spain
17 Feb 1412DiedBishop of Oviedo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Guillermo García Manrique
Bishop Guillermo García Manrique (died ) Bishop of Oviedo

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 382, and Page 444

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 27 Apr 2021

Quantcast