Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Juan García Manrique

Deceased

Archbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain

Administrator of Coimbra

Administrator of Tuy


Events

DateEventTitle
5 Jan 1371AppointedBishop of Orense, Spain
5 Oct 1375AppointedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain
20 Aug 1381AppointedBishop of Burgos, Spain
11 Aug 1382AppointedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
28 Jan 1394AppointedAdministrator of Tuy, Spain
2 Jun 1402AppointedAdministrator of Coimbra, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Juan García Manrique
Archbishop Juan García Manrique , Archbishop of Santiago de Compostela

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 119, and Page 444
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 151, and Page 200
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 501, and Page 196

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 10 Aug 2021

Quantcast