Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pascual Garcia

Deceased

Bishop of Astorga, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
29 Jan 1382AppointedBishop of Orense, Spain
19 Oct 1390AppointedBishop of Astorga, Spain
4 Mar 1393DiedBishop of Astorga, Spain

MicroData Summary for Pascual Garcia
Bishop Pascual Garcia (died ) Bishop of Astorga

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 114, and Page 119

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 22 Apr 2021

Quantcast